Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts with George R. Peck presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management36 days |
|
Filing DateJanuary 17, 2019 |
CategoryTort-Motor Vehicle |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time791 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 01, 2019 | Hearing |
Settled Central Jury Judge: Peck, Hon. George R. |
|
April 01, 2019 | Hearing |
SETTLED BEFORE TRIAL CENTRAL JURY Judge: GEORGE R. PECK |
|
March 20, 2019 | Hearing |
Adjourned Central Jury TOD0325 (Conversion) Judge: Peck, Hon. George R. |
|
March 20, 2019 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED CENTRAL JURY TOD0325 Judge: GEORGE R. PECK |
|
March 06, 2019 | Hearing |
Adjourned Central Jury TOD0308 (Conversion) Judge: Peck, Hon. George R. |
|
March 06, 2019 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED CENTRAL JURY TOD0308 Judge: GEORGE R. PECK |
|
February 21, 2019 | Hearing |
Adjourned Central Jury TOD0226 (Conversion) Judge: Peck, Hon. George R. |
|
February 21, 2019 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED CENTRAL JURY TOD0226 Judge: GEORGE R. PECK |
|
January 17, 2019 | Hearing |
Adjourned Central Jury TOD0123 (Conversion) Judge: Peck, Hon. George R. |
|
January 17, 2019 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED CENTRAL JURY TOD0123 Judge: GEORGE R. PECK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.