Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Other case in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts with DCM CONFERENCE JUDGE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 30, 2007 |
CategoryOther |
Last RefreshedSeptember 19, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
|
Case Cycle Time438 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 10, 2009 | Hearing |
SETTLED BEFORE TRIAL DCM PRETRIAL PART DM0613 Judge: DANIEL MARTIN |
|
July 29, 2008 | Hearing |
CERTIFICATION CONFERENCE HELD DANIEL MARTIN (CERC) 9:30AM Judge: DANIEL MARTIN |
|
June 26, 2008 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED DANIEL MARTIN (CERC) 9:30AM Judge: DANIEL MARTIN |
|
April 09, 2008 | Hearing |
COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE HELD DANIEL MARTIN (COMC) Judge: DANIEL MARTIN |
|
November 30, 2007 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE HELD DANIEL MARTIN (PC PART) Judge: DANIEL MARTIN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.