Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts with Jeffrey S. Brown presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 15, 2015 |
CategoryTort-Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Cycle Time247 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 18, 2016 | Hearing |
Other Final Disposition (Pre-Note) Jeffrey S. Brown (Cerc PT) BY SFO (Conversion) Judge: Brown, Hon. Jeffrey S. |
|
August 18, 2016 | Hearing |
OTHER FINAL DISP. (PRE-NOTE) JEFFREY S. BROWN (CERC PT) BY SFO Judge: JEFFREY S. BROWN |
|
June 16, 2016 | Hearing |
Adjourned Jeffrey S. Brown (Cerc PT) BY SFO (Conversion) Judge: Brown, Hon. Jeffrey S. |
|
June 16, 2016 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED JEFFREY S. BROWN (CERC PT) BY SFO Judge: JEFFREY S. BROWN |
|
March 22, 2016 | Hearing |
Held Jeffrey S. Brown (Comc PT) Supreme Trial; BY SFO (Conversion) Judge: Brown, Hon. Jeffrey S. |
|
March 22, 2016 | Hearing |
COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE HELD JEFFREY S. BROWN (COMC PT) BY SFO Judge: JEFFREY S. BROWN |
|
January 25, 2016 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted - No Opposition (Motion #001) Jeffrey S. Brown (Motion PT) TO JSB 12/24 (Conversion) Judge: Brown, Hon. Jeffrey S. |
|
January 25, 2016 | Hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED - NO OPP (Motion #001) JEFFREY S. BROWN (MOTION PT) TO JSB 12/24 Judge: JEFFREY S. BROWN |
|
December 23, 2015 | Motion |
Consolidate (Motion #001) Decided: 01/26/2016Decided Before Justice: Brown, Hon. Jeffrey S. Answer demanded: Yes Judge: Brown, Hon. Jeffrey S. |
|
December 23, 2015 | Motion |
CONSOLIDATE (SINGLE ACTION) (Motion #001) Decided: 01/26/2016MOTION DECIDED Before Justice: JEFFREY S. BROWN Answer demanded: Yes Judge: JEFFREY S. BROWN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.