Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Capital One, N.A., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Hughes, Adam Michael, against Joseph D Allen, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, NY, . Montgomery County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 17, 2023 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedFebruary 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
AFFIDAVIT
Date: May 03, 2023JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: May 03, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: May 03, 2023JUDGMENT
Date: May 04, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 17, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 08, 2023202.27-B MAILING RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE
Date: March 27, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: March 27, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 04, 2023 | JUDGMENT | ||
May 03, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
May 03, 2023 | ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT | ||
May 03, 2023 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
May 03, 2023 | AFFIRMATION | ||
March 27, 2023 | 202.27-B MAILING RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE | ||
March 27, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 dmv abstract |
||
March 08, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
March 08, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
February 17, 2023 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.