Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Edleston, Mary Elizabeth, filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with Philip A. Champlin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2006 |
CategoryChange Of Name/Gender |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeName Change |
Case Cycle Time56 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 14, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order 214210-Order Filed/Issued By: 912320 - Petitioner Pro Per ORDER [214210] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PETITIONER PRO PER [912320] |
|
February 14, 2007 | Docket Event |
Minute Order 213610-Minute Order Filed/Issued By: MINUTE ORDER [213610] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
|
February 14, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause (Non-DCSS) 231210-OSC Hearing; In the Matter of Edleston, M. Motion OSC Details: 221160 - Name Change ; Judge: J21120 Champlin Philip A. Judge: Champlin, Philip A. |
|
February 14, 2007 | Docket Event |
Converted Stat Closure Disposition Date: Feb 14 2007 Type: 244710 - Judgment: Court Finding Manner : 241110 - Before Trial |
|
February 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Affidavit: Proof of Publication 233120-Affidavit of Publication Filed/Issued By: 241110 - Agency AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION [233120] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By AGENCY [241110] |
|
February 07, 2007 | Docket Event |
Certification 233320-Certification Filed/Issued By: 923110 - Clerk CERTIFICATION [233320] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By CLERK [923110] |
|
February 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
Other NOTICE [212910] ; ; ; ; CLERK [923110] |
|
December 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
Order: Show Cause 214220-Order: Show Cause Motion/OSC Detail: 221160 - Name Change Filed/Issued By: 912320 - Petitioner Pro Per ORDER: SHOW CAUSE [214220] Motion: NAME CHANGE [221160] Additional Description : Filed By PETITIONER PRO PER [912320] |
|
December 20, 2006 | Docket Event |
Petition Filed 212110-Petition Filed/Issued By: 912320 - Petitioner Pro Per PETITION [212110] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PETITIONER PRO PER [912320] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.