Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Lakeview Loan Servicing, Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Di Caro, John A, against Brian D. Gustas, Cendant Mortgage Corporation, Discover Bank, John Doe, Said Name Being Fictitious, It Being The Intention Of Plaintiff To Designate Any And All Occupants Of Premises Being Foreclosed Herein, And Any Parties, Corporations Or Entities, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest Or Lien Upon The Mortgaged Premises, Montgomery County Clerk'S Office, (total of 5) See All represented by Koren, Jonathan, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, NY, . Montgomery County, NY Superior Courts with Rebecca A Slezak presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 16, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedFebruary 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 21, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 04, 2023REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: August 08, 2023COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 16, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: June 16, 2023SUMMONS WITH NOTICE
Date: June 16, 2023CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: June 16, 2023NOTICE TO DEFENDANT (PER AO-131-20)
Date: June 16, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 20, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: July 19, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 13, 2023ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: July 19, 2023RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: July 21, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 19, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 21, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 27, 2023OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: July 21, 2023ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: July 21, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 20, 2023OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: July 21, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 21, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
October 04, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Status of Loss Mitigation Letter |
||
August 08, 2023 | REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S) | ||
July 21, 2023 | RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | ||
July 21, 2023 | Affidavit of Service by Mail | ||
July 21, 2023 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT JUDICIAL ASSIGNMENT LETTER |
||
July 21, 2023 | ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) | ||
July 21, 2023 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT Foreclosure Settlement Conference Notice |
||
July 19, 2023 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
July 19, 2023 | ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.