Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Bank Of America, N.A., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Brown, Adam Michael, Poletti, Matthew Ryan, against Sean J Gable, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, NY, . Montgomery County, NY Superior Courts with Rebecca A Slezak presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 15, 2023 |
CategoryOther Matters - Contract Non-Commercial |
Last RefreshedFebruary 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: October 27, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: August 10, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: August 10, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: August 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1) Declaration of Damages Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 10, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 10, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 10, 2023OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: July 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Ex. C Transactional History Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 15, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Ex. B Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 15, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: June 19, 2023OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: July 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Ex. A Contract Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 15, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 27, 2023 | ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT | ||
August 10, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
August 10, 2023 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
August 10, 2023 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
August 10, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Defendant's Answer |
||
August 10, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Declaration of Damages Redacted per 22 NYCRR Declaration of Damages Redacted |
||
August 10, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) | ||
August 10, 2023 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment and Brief in Support |
||
July 03, 2023 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT VERIFIED ANSWER TO FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT |
||
July 03, 2023 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.