Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Coryne Leonard, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Mendoza, Cristen Marie, against Mohammad Baghaei-Rad D.M.D., represented by Depaolo, Aaron M., in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, NY, . Montgomery County, NY Superior Courts with Rebecca A Slezak presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 13, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Medical, Dental, Or Podiatrist Malpractice |
Last RefreshedJanuary 31, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MEDICAL, DENTAL OR PODIATRIC MALPRACTICE
Date: November 17, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: November 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: November 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: November 17, 2023NOTICE OF MEDICAL MALPRACTICE
Date: November 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: November 17, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: December 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Plaintiff's Bill of Particulars Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 17, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 12, 2023ANSWER
Date: July 12, 2023CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: June 13, 2023SUMMONS
Date: June 13, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: June 13, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 13, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED | ||
November 20, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
November 17, 2023 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MEDICAL, DENTAL OR PODIATRIC MALPRACTICE | ||
November 17, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Summons, Complaint & Cert. of Merit |
||
November 17, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D Plaintiff's Response to Discovery Demands |
||
November 17, 2023 | NOTICE OF MEDICAL MALPRACTICE | ||
November 17, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Ex. B_Defendant's Answer |
||
November 17, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Plaintiff's Bill of Particulars Redacted per 22 NYCRR Plaintiff's Bill of Particulars Redacted |
||
July 12, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 12, 2023 |
ANSWER Defendant's Answer |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.