Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Stiller, Craig Scott, Winograd, Ian Zev, against David Becker, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, NY, . Montgomery County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 26, 2023 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedFebruary 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: July 17, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: July 11, 2023JUDGMENT
Date: July 12, 2023ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT
Date: July 12, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: July 11, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: July 11, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 11, 2023JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: July 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: May 26, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 26, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 26, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 31, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 31, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 17, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
July 12, 2023 | JUDGMENT | ||
July 12, 2023 | ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT | ||
July 11, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION OF SERVICE |
||
July 11, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 AFFIRMATION OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS |
||
July 11, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR | ||
July 11, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIRMATION |
||
July 11, 2023 | AFFIRMATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE | ||
July 11, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT 2-AFFIDAVIT OF PURCHASE AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT SELLER |
||
July 11, 2023 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.