Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Bankunited N.A., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Nierer, Cynthia Anne, against Discover Bank, Faith Byroad A K A Faith A. Denino, John Does And Jane Does, Said Names Being Fictitious, Parties Intended Being Possible Tenants Or Occupants Of Premises, And Corporations, Other Entities Or Persons Who Claim, Or May Claim, A Lien Against The Premises, Joseph A. Denino, Secretary Of Housing And Urban Development, (total of 5) See All represented by Reynolds, Ransom Pratt, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, NY, . Montgomery County, NY Superior Courts with Hon. Felix J Catena presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 19, 2022 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 19, 2022CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: September 19, 2022NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: September 19, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 19, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 12, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 06, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 01, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 01, 2022RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: December 08, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: December 08, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 08, 2022ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: December 08, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 09, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 12, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 25, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 25, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: April 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 25, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: April 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 25, 2023ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 10, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 25, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: August 09, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 08, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 09, 2023 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED Stay further proceedings |
||
August 08, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Regarding Bankruptcy Filing on July 3, 2023. |
||
July 10, 2023 |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) Order of Reference and Default Judgment |
||
April 25, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) 90 DAY NOTICES |
||
April 25, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) AFFIRMATION OF CPLR 3408 |
||
April 25, 2023 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
April 25, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) NOTE |
||
April 25, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) RECORDED MORTGAGE & LOAN MODIFICATIONS |
||
April 25, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #1) AFFIDAVITS OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO CPLR 3215g |
||
April 25, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #1) FILED SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.