Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Bank Of America, N.A., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Flynn, Kristine D., Sheerin, John J, Valle, Jonathan Irving, against Heather Clouser, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, NY, . Montgomery County, NY Superior Courts with Rebecca A Slezak presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRebecca A Slezak Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 20, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedDecember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 20, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 20, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 22, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: February 16, 2022ORDER - OTHER
Date: February 16, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: November 17, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: February 17, 2022OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: November 12, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: February 16, 2022JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)
Date: February 16, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 11, 2021RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #01)
Date: November 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #01)
Date: November 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #01)
Date: November 11, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: October 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #01)
Date: November 11, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 22, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: November 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #01)
Date: November 11, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 11, 2021ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT
Date: November 03, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 26, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 17, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
February 16, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
February 16, 2022 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
February 16, 2022 | AFFIRMATION | ||
February 16, 2022 | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) | ||
November 17, 2021 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
November 12, 2021 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ASSIGNMENT NOTICE |
||
November 11, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 11, 2021 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
November 11, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #01) EXHIBIT 5- AFFIRMATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.