Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Deutsche Bank National Trust Company As Trustee For, Novastar Home Equity Loan Asset-Backed Certificate Series 2006-6, Novastar Mortgage Funding Trust Series 2006-6, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Boriskin, Sara Z., Jacob, Leah Nicole, against Barbara A. Clements, Cach Llc, Capital One Bank, Curtiss A. Clements, Ford Motor Credit Company Llc, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, NY, . Montgomery County, NY Superior Courts with Rebecca A Slezak presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRebecca A Slezak Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2015 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJuly 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
COMPLAINT
Date: September 03, 2015OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: January 30, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: October 08, 2015OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: October 07, 2015OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: October 08, 2015COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: September 03, 2015CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: September 03, 2015OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: January 30, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: January 30, 2018CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: September 03, 2015OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: January 30, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 03, 2015NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: September 03, 2015OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: February 05, 2018SUMMONS
Date: September 03, 2015OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 11, 2015OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: August 13, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 23, 2015OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 11, 2015OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: October 07, 2015OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: October 06, 2015OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 23, 2015OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: October 06, 2015OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 16, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #8)
Date: March 09, 2023OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: August 01, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 22, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #8)
Date: March 09, 2023OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: May 16, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 11, 2015OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: August 06, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 17, 2015OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 24, 2015OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 11, 2015OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 11, 2015OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 11, 2015OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: October 01, 2015OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 24, 2015OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: January 30, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 24, 2015OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 17, 2015OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: August 01, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: October 07, 2015OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: January 23, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #8)
Date: March 09, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #8)
Date: March 09, 2023OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: October 01, 2015OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: May 25, 2018NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: November 04, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 15, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #8)
Date: March 09, 2023OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 15, 2020NOTICE OF ENTRY *Corrected*
Date: March 11, 2022OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 18, 2017OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: August 13, 2018ORDER - OTHER
Date: March 10, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #8)
Date: March 09, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #8)
Date: March 10, 2023NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: November 04, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 14, 2022NOTICE OF PENDENCY *Corrected*
Date: April 19, 2022OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: October 19, 2015OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: October 08, 2015BILL OF COSTS Â (Motion #8)
Date: March 09, 2023OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 18, 2017OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: May 11, 2016OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: June 15, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #8)
Date: March 09, 2023OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 18, 2017OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: June 19, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: August 14, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: August 14, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: August 14, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: June 12, 2018NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: June 12, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: May 31, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: August 06, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: August 13, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: January 23, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: August 14, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: August 14, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: May 10, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: May 31, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: January 23, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: June 12, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: August 14, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: August 14, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: August 14, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: July 18, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #8)
Date: March 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #8)
Date: March 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #8)
Date: March 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #8)
Date: March 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #8)
Date: March 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #8)
Date: March 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #8)
Date: March 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #8)
Date: March 09, 2023OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: August 06, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: May 02, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: April 19, 2019NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: May 10, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: December 07, 2018NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: August 14, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 04, 2020OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: August 14, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: August 14, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: August 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - U Â (Motion #8)
Date: March 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - V Â (Motion #8)
Date: March 09, 2023OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 04, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #8)
Date: March 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #8)
Date: March 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #8)
Date: March 09, 2023SUPPORTING PAPERS TO MOTION Â (Motion #8)
Date: March 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #8)
Date: March 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - S Â (Motion #8)
Date: March 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - T Â (Motion #8)
Date: March 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #8)
Date: March 09, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 10, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #8) Affirmation of Service |
||
March 09, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #8) D- Assignment of Mortgage |
||
March 09, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - R (Motion #8) R- Power of Attorney |
||
March 09, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #8) F- 90 Day Notice |
||
March 09, 2023 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #8) Order Confirming Referee Report and Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale |
||
March 09, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #8) Attorney Affirmation in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for an Order Confirming Referee Report and Jud Attorney Affirmation in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for an Order Confirming Referee Report and Jud ... show more |
||
March 09, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #8) G- Affirmation of Non-Military Service |
||
March 09, 2023 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #8) Notice of Motion for an Order Confirming Referee Report and Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale |
||
March 09, 2023 |
BILL OF COSTS (Motion #8) Costs to Plaintiff |
||
March 09, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #8) E- Notice of Default |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.