Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) General Insurance - Insurance case in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County. This case was filed in Montgomery County Superior Courts with HON. JOSEPH M. SISE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 09, 2011 |
CategoryInsurance |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Insurance |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 24, 2013 | Hearing |
PRE-OTHER SISE (Court Activity) Judge: HON. JOSEPH M. SISE |
|
January 24, 2013 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #002) SISE (Motion Part) Judge: HON. JOSEPH M. SISE |
|
September 17, 2012 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #002) SISE (Motion Part) Judge: HON. JOSEPH M. SISE |
|
August 27, 2012 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #002) SISE (Motion Part) Judge: HON. JOSEPH M. SISE |
|
August 27, 2012 | Hearing |
PRE-NOTE POST JUDGEMENT APPLICATION SISE (Court Activity) Judge: HON. JOSEPH M. SISE |
|
August 27, 2012 | Motion |
NOM SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Motion #002) Decided: 01/24/2013IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF Before Justice: HON. JOSEPH M. SISE Answer demanded: No Judge: HON. JOSEPH M. SISE |
|
March 05, 2012 | Hearing |
PRE-OTHER SISE (Court Activity) Judge: HON. JOSEPH M. SISE |
|
March 05, 2012 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001) SISE (Motion Part) Judge: HON. JOSEPH M. SISE |
|
January 17, 2012 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #001) SISE (Motion Part) Judge: HON. JOSEPH M. SISE |
|
November 09, 2011 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #001) SISE (Motion Part) Judge: HON. JOSEPH M. SISE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.