Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Midfirst Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Falasco, Todd C, Tremaroli, Robert Steven, against Citifinancial Company, Evan M Vanderwall Aka Evan Vanderwall Aka Evan Mark Vanderwall, Household Finance Corp Iiii, John Doe #1 Through John Doe #10, Secretary Of Housing And Urban Development, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, NY, . Monroe County, NY Superior Courts with Sam Valleriani presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 21, 2017 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedOctober 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMonroe County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 24, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: April 13, 2022NOTICE OF SALE
Date: January 13, 2022NOTICE OF SALE
Date: March 24, 2022NOTICE OF SALE
Date: April 13, 2022REFEREE REPORT OF AMOUNT DUE
Date: July 05, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: August 04, 2022FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM
Date: July 05, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: August 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: August 04, 2022ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: July 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: August 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #2)
Date: August 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: August 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #2) Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #2)
Date: August 04, 2022COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: August 21, 2017CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: January 11, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 08, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: December 20, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 01, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 13, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: August 04, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 04, 2022ORDER - OTHER
Date: September 02, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: September 29, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 29, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 29, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
September 29, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 02, 2022 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
August 04, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
August 04, 2022 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
August 04, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Affidavits of Service |
||
August 04, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Summons, Complaint and Notice of Pendency Redacted per 22 NYCRR Summons, Complaint and Notice of Pendency Redacted |
||
August 04, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Notice of Appearance |
||
August 04, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #2) Sale Postponement Notice |
||
August 04, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #2) Order of Reference |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.