Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
M&T Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Falasco, Todd C, Jones, Roxanne L., Tremaroli, Robert Steven, against Beneficial New York Inc, Beneficial New York, Inc, City Of Rochester, John Doe #1 Through John Doe #10, Midland Credit Management, Inc, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, NY, . Monroe County, NY Superior Courts with Sam Valleriani presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 21, 2013 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMonroe County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 02, 2022COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: March 21, 2013CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: January 11, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: August 02, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 08, 2021HARDSHIP DECLARATION
Date: July 27, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: August 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 02, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 02, 2022NOTICE OF PENDENCY 2nd LP Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: February 15, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: August 02, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 02, 2022 | ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY | ||
August 02, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #4) Notice of appearance |
||
August 02, 2022 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
August 02, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #4) Summons, Complaint and Notice of Pendency Redacted per 22 NYCRR Summons, Complaint and Notice of Pendency Redacted |
||
August 02, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
August 02, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #4) Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale |
||
August 02, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #4) Order of Reference |
||
August 02, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 02, 2022 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
February 15, 2022 |
NOTICE OF PENDENCY 2nd LP Redacted per 22 NYCRR 2nd LP Redacted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.