Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Ebf Holdings, Llc D B A Everest Business Funding, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Bouskila, Ariel, against Julio Cesar Londono, Julio Cesar Londono D B A Distribuidora Del Valle, represented by Dale, Dominick R., in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, NY, . Monroe County, NY Superior Courts with Sam Valleriani presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSam Valleriani Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 23, 2023 |
CategoryOther Matters - Contract - Other |
Last RefreshedJanuary 25, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationMonroe County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #4)
Date: January 12, 2024NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 12, 2024NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: October 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #4)
Date: January 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #4)
Date: January 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #4)
Date: January 12, 2024ORDER (PROPOSED) (AMENDED)
Date: October 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #4)
Date: January 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #4) rpa Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 12, 2024ORDER - OTHER
Date: November 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #4)
Date: January 12, 2024DECISION ON MOTION -SUBMIT ORD / JGMT
Date: October 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #4)
Date: January 12, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: October 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #4)
Date: January 12, 2024MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: October 12, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: November 01, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: October 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #4)
Date: January 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #4)
Date: January 12, 2024SUPPORTING PAPERS TO MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #4)
Date: January 12, 2024ORDER - OTHER
Date: September 28, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: September 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #4)
Date: January 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #4)
Date: January 12, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #4)
Date: January 12, 2024ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: January 02, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A MERCHANT AGREEMENT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 23, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 23, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: September 12, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 27, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: July 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 10, 2023ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: July 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: July 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 10, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: July 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: July 05, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: July 01, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: July 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 31, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: July 05, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: July 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: July 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 31, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: July 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 31, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 31, 2023NOTICE TO ADMIT
Date: July 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 31, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: July 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F proof of funding Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C funding app Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 05, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 05, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: July 05, 2023ORDER (PROPOSED) (AMENDED)
Date: September 12, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 05, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: July 09, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: July 05, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: July 05, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: July 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 09, 2023DECISION ON MOTION -SUBMIT ORD / JGMT
Date: September 12, 2023DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: July 01, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: July 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: July 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 09, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: July 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 31, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: July 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 31, 2023PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: July 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A MERCHANT AGREEMENT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #3) rpa Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 31, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: September 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 10, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: July 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 31, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 12, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #4) Alpha 1 |
||
January 12, 2024 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
January 12, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #4) Paramount Roofing |
||
January 12, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #4) demand for discovery and documents |
||
January 12, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #4) discovery email |
||
January 12, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #4) expert affidavit |
||
January 12, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion #4) rpa Redacted per 22 NYCRR rpa Redacted |
||
January 12, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #4) email correspondence |
||
January 12, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #4) J&J Landscaping |
||
January 12, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #4) A Plus Remodeling |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.