Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Janet A Shaw His Spouse, Robert E Shaw, filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Comerford, John P., against Abb, Inc. Individually And As Successor In Interest To Ite Imperial Co. F K A Ite Circuit Breaker Co., Air & Liquid Systems Corporation As Successor By Merger To Buffalo Pumps, Inc., Alray Construction Corp. F K A Hebert Construction Corp., Armstrong International, Inc., Armstrong Pumps Inc., (total of 47) See All represented by Botticelli, Jason Anthony, Brooks, Stephen Philip, Bui, Thuy T, Burgasser, Jessica Jean, Chetta, Rosario, (total of 30) See All in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, NY, . Monroe County, NY Superior Courts with Erin P Gall presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeErin P Gall Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 20, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Asbestos |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMonroe County, NY |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
Abb, Inc. Individually And As Successor In Interest To Ite Imperial Co. F K A Ite Circuit Breaker Co.
Eaton Corporation Individually And As Successor In Interest To Eaton Electrical, Inc. And Cutler-Hammer, Inc.
Flowserve Corporation F K A The Duriron Company, Inc. Sued As Successor By Merger To Durco International
Flowserve Us, Inc. Solely As Successor To Rockwell Manufacturing Company Edward Valves, Inc. And Edward Vogt Valve Company
Honeywell International Inc. F K A Alliedsignal, Inc. And As Successor In Interest To The Bendix Corporation
Itt Corporation F K A Itt Industries, Inc. Individually And As Successor To Itt Fluid Products Corp. Itt Hoffman Itt Bell & Gossett Company And Itt Marlow
Paramount Global F K A Viacomcbs Inc. F K A Cbs Corporation A Delaware Corporation F K A Viacom Inc. Successor By Merger To Cbs Corporation A Pennsylvania Corporation F K A Westinghouse Electric Corporation
EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #4)
Date: January 12, 2024ORDER - DISMISSAL Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 05, 2023ANSWER
Date: November 03, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #4)
Date: January 12, 2024DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 12, 2024DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 09, 2024ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 07, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: December 07, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 24, 2023ANSWER
Date: August 11, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: August 22, 2023ANSWER
Date: August 11, 2023NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: September 07, 2023ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED) Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 24, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #8)
Date: January 24, 2024ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: July 19, 2023ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED) Â (Motion #8)
Date: January 24, 2024ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED) Â (Motion #7)
Date: January 23, 2024NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #7)
Date: January 23, 2024ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #6)
Date: January 22, 2024NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #6)
Date: January 22, 2024NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #5)
Date: January 19, 2024AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #5)
Date: January 19, 2024ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED)
Date: January 18, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #4)
Date: January 12, 2024DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 11, 2024DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 12, 2024DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 10, 2024DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 11, 2024NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: January 08, 2024DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 11, 2024DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 08, 2024DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 09, 2024DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 07, 2023ORDER - DISMISSAL Â (Motion #3)
Date: January 08, 2024DEMAND FOR: *Corrected*
Date: December 20, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: November 03, 2023ORDER - DISMISSAL Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 02, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 07, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: November 13, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 11, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 11, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 11, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 20, 2023ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: March 31, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: April 06, 2023ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: April 10, 2023ANSWER
Date: April 10, 2023ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: April 05, 2023INTERROGATORIES
Date: April 11, 2023ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: April 07, 2023RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: March 23, 2023ANSWER
Date: June 09, 2023ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: May 31, 2023ANSWER
Date: June 15, 2023ANSWER
Date: April 11, 2023ANSWER
Date: June 08, 2023ANSWER
Date: June 15, 2023ORDER - TRIAL SCHEDULING
Date: May 03, 2023ANSWER
Date: June 09, 2023ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: May 11, 2023ANSWER
Date: April 11, 2023ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: May 23, 2023ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: April 26, 2023ANSWER
Date: May 16, 2023ANSWER
Date: July 12, 2023ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: June 26, 2023ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: June 23, 2023INTERROGATORIES
Date: April 11, 2023ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: April 12, 2023ANSWER
Date: April 19, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 19, 2023ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: April 21, 2023ANSWER
Date: April 19, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: April 20, 2023ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: April 24, 2023ANSWER
Date: April 25, 2023ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: April 25, 2023ANSWER
Date: April 25, 2023ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: April 18, 2023ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: April 27, 2023ANSWER
Date: April 25, 2023ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: March 23, 2023ANSWER
Date: May 03, 2023ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: May 24, 2023ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: May 23, 2023COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: May 31, 2023SUMMONS-SUPPLEMENTAL (POST RJI)
Date: May 31, 2023ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: April 04, 2023ANSWER
Date: April 03, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: April 03, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: April 11, 2023ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: April 04, 2023ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: April 13, 2023ANSWER
Date: May 31, 2023ANSWER
Date: May 26, 2023ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: May 31, 2023NOTICE TO COUNTY CLERK - AMENDMENT OF CAPTION
Date: May 31, 2023ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: May 31, 2023ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: June 08, 2023ANSWER
Date: April 25, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 15, 2023ANSWER
Date: June 15, 2023ANSWER
Date: June 15, 2023ANSWER
Date: June 20, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 09, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 24, 2024 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #8) Notice of Motion for No Opposition Summary Judgement Motion & Order - Ridge Construction Corporation |
||
January 24, 2024 |
ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED) (Motion #8) Signed No Opposition Summary Judgment Motion & Order as to Ridge Construction Corporation Only |
||
January 23, 2024 |
ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED) (Motion #7) No Opposition Summary Judgment Order |
||
January 23, 2024 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #7) Canvas MW, LLC |
||
January 22, 2024 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #6) Proposed No Opp Order Siemens Industry Inc. |
||
January 22, 2024 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #6) NOM No Opposition Summary Judgment Siemens Industry Inc. |
||
January 19, 2024 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #5) Notice of Motion re So Ordered NOSJM as to Flowserve US |
||
January 19, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #5) Affirmation of Counsel in support of Motion |
||
January 19, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #5) Exhibit A - Executed NOSJM as to Flowserve US |
||
January 18, 2024 |
ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED) signed NOSJM as to Flowserve US |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.