Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Fairport Asset Management Reo, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Bartley, Alana Renee, against John M Curtis, in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, NY, . Monroe County, NY Superior Courts with William K Taylor presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2023 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedJanuary 30, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationMonroe County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 29, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 29, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: January 04, 2023SUMMONS
Date: January 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: January 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: January 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: January 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: January 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: January 04, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 01, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 01, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 01, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 01, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 01, 2023JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED)
Date: June 26, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: May 01, 2023JUDGMENT
Date: June 28, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 29, 2023 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) Notice of entry of order and judgment |
||
June 29, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of service |
||
June 28, 2023 | JUDGMENT | ||
June 26, 2023 |
JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) Proposed order and judgment with bill of costs |
||
May 01, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1) Affirmation of service |
||
May 01, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1) Filed summons and complaint |
||
May 01, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of service |
||
May 01, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1) Affirmation in Support of Motion for Default Judgment |
||
May 01, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #1) Affidavit of service of summons and complaint |
||
May 01, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #1) Affidavit of mailing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.