Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Joshua D. Gingrich, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Rizzo, Seema Ali, against Kimberley T. Gingrich, represented by Ferrero, Vincent Marc, in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, NY, . Monroe County, NY Superior Courts with James E Walsh Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 22, 2022 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedJune 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMonroe County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 03, 2023 | REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S) | ||
December 30, 2022 | PLAINTIFF'S STATEMENT OF PROPOSED DISPOSITION | ||
December 28, 2022 | STATEMENT OF NET WORTH | ||
December 27, 2022 | STATEMENT OF NET WORTH | ||
December 08, 2022 | ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) | ||
December 05, 2022 | NOTICE | ||
December 05, 2022 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
December 05, 2022 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
December 02, 2022 | MATRIMONIAL ADDENDUM (840M) | ||
December 02, 2022 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.