Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Paula A. Karnisky His Spouse, Paula A. Karnisky His Spouse, Robert A. Karnisky, filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Comerford, John P., Esford, Sean Michael, against Air & Liquid Systems Corporation As Successor By Merger To Buffalo Pumps, Inc., Air & Liquid Systems Corporation As Successor By Merger To Buffalo Pumps, Inc., Alray Construction Corp. F K A Hebert Construction Corp., Alray Construction Corp. F K A Hebert Construction Corp., Armstrong International, Inc., (total of 64) See All represented by Botticelli, Jason Anthony, Bui, Thuy T, Burgasser, Jessica Jean, Carlucci, Maria C., Connor, Maryellen, (total of 32) See All in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, NY, . Monroe County, NY Superior Courts with Erin P Gall presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeErin P Gall Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 09, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Asbestos |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMonroe County, NY |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
Flowserve Corporation F K A The Duriron Company, Inc. Sued As Successor By Merger To Durco International
Flowserve Corporation F K A The Duriron Company, Inc. Sued As Successor By Merger To Durco International
Flowserve Us, Inc. Solely As Successor To Rockwell Manufacturing Company Edward Valves, Inc. And Edward Vogt Valve Company
Flowserve Us, Inc. Solely As Successor To Rockwell Manufacturing Company Edward Valves, Inc. And Edward Vogt Valve Company
Honeywell International Inc. F K A Alliedsignal, Inc. And As Successor In Interest To The Bendix Corporation
Honeywell International Inc. F K A Alliedsignal, Inc. And As Successor In Interest To The Bendix Corporation
Itt Corporation F K A Itt Industries, Inc. Individually And As Successor To Itt Fluid Products Corp. Itt Hoffman Itt Bell & Gossett Company And Itt Marlow
Itt Corporation F K A Itt Industries, Inc. Individually And As Successor To Itt Fluid Products Corp. Itt Hoffman Itt Bell & Gossett Company And Itt Marlow
Met-Pro Technologies Llc A Ceco Environmental Company Successor By Merger To Met-Pro Corporation On Behalf Of Its Dean Pump Division
Met-Pro Technologies Llc A Ceco Environmental Company Successor By Merger To Met-Pro Corporation On Behalf Of Its Dean Pump Division
Riley Power Inc. F K A Babcock Borsig Power, Inc. F K A Db Riley, Inc. F K A Riley Stoker Corporation
Riley Power Inc. F K A Babcock Borsig Power, Inc. F K A Db Riley, Inc. F K A Riley Stoker Corporation
Spx Cooling Technologies, Inc. F K A Marley Cooling Technologies, Inc. F K A The Marley Cooling Tower Company
Spx Cooling Technologies, Inc. F K A Marley Cooling Technologies, Inc. F K A The Marley Cooling Tower Company
Watts Water Technologies, Inc F K A Watts Industries, Inc, Individually And As Successor To Mueller Steam Specialty Company
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 09, 2021ANSWER
Date: December 28, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 28, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 28, 2021ANSWER
Date: January 10, 2022INTERROGATORIES
Date: January 10, 2022PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: January 10, 2022ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: January 10, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 13, 2022STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: April 29, 2022ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: July 06, 2021ORDER - TRIAL SCHEDULING
Date: March 22, 2022NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: April 29, 2022ORDER - DISMISSAL Â (Motion #10)
Date: April 12, 2022ORDER - DISMISSAL Â (Motion #6)
Date: May 11, 2022ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: March 28, 2022ORDER - DISMISSAL Â (Motion #7)
Date: May 11, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #11)
Date: May 04, 2022ADMISSION OF SERVICE
Date: July 06, 2021ANSWER
Date: July 08, 2021ANSWER
Date: July 22, 2021ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: July 09, 2021ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: February 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #5)
Date: February 15, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #6)
Date: February 22, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 13, 2022ORDER - DISMISSAL Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A. Â (Motion #6)
Date: February 22, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: February 22, 2022ANSWER
Date: July 14, 2021ANSWER
Date: July 26, 2021ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: August 05, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #7)
Date: February 22, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #8)
Date: February 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A. Â (Motion #7)
Date: February 22, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #8)
Date: February 28, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #9)
Date: February 28, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #10)
Date: March 01, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #10)
Date: March 01, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #9)
Date: February 28, 2022ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED) Â (Motion #10)
Date: March 01, 2022ORDER - DISMISSAL Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 15, 2022ORDER - DISMISSAL Â (Motion #3)
Date: March 15, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 18, 2022ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: January 31, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 18, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 27, 2022ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: January 31, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 19, 2022ORDER - TRIAL SCHEDULING
Date: May 12, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 18, 2022ANSWER
Date: December 17, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 09, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 17, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 22, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #11)
Date: June 23, 2022ANSWER
Date: February 14, 2022ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING *Corrected*
Date: May 18, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: May 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A.
Date: May 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 09, 2022ORDER - DISMISSAL Â (Motion #11)
Date: June 14, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 09, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: February 11, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #3)
Date: February 11, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #12)
Date: July 08, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: May 12, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: July 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A.
Date: May 12, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #18)
Date: July 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #12)
Date: July 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #16)
Date: July 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #12)
Date: July 08, 2022ADMISSION OF SERVICE Â (Motion #11)
Date: May 04, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #16)
Date: July 08, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: July 08, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: July 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #12)
Date: July 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #16)
Date: July 08, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #13)
Date: July 08, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 14, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #14)
Date: July 08, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #15)
Date: July 08, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #15)
Date: July 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #15)
Date: July 08, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: July 08, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #14)
Date: July 08, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #13)
Date: July 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #14)
Date: July 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #12) Pltfs Answer to Rogs
Date: July 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #12)
Date: July 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #12)
Date: July 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #4)
Date: February 15, 2022CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: August 04, 2022ORDER - DISMISSAL Â (Motion #15)
Date: August 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #16)
Date: July 08, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #19)
Date: August 08, 2022ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED)
Date: August 08, 2022ORDER - DISMISSAL Â (Motion #14)
Date: August 09, 2022CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: July 14, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #5)
Date: February 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #16)
Date: July 08, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: May 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #16)
Date: July 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #16)
Date: July 08, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW Â (Motion #20)
Date: October 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #16)
Date: July 08, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #15)
Date: August 16, 2022ORDER - DISMISSAL Â (Motion #13)
Date: August 09, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: July 14, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #13)
Date: August 16, 2022ORDER - DISMISSAL Â (Motion #12)
Date: August 17, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #24)
Date: October 12, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: July 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #23)
Date: October 06, 2022ORDER - DISMISSAL Â (Motion #16)
Date: August 17, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #14)
Date: August 16, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: October 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #11)
Date: May 04, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #11)
Date: May 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #12)
Date: July 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #16) Pltfs Answers to Rogs
Date: July 08, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #14)
Date: July 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #17)
Date: July 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #15)
Date: July 08, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #15)
Date: July 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #14)
Date: July 08, 2022PRE-TRIAL DOCUMENT(S)
Date: September 29, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #15)
Date: July 08, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #13)
Date: July 08, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #17)
Date: July 13, 2022PRE-TRIAL DOCUMENT(S)
Date: September 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #17)
Date: July 13, 2022PROOF OF SERVICE Â (Motion #20)
Date: October 06, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #20)
Date: October 06, 2022PRE-TRIAL DOCUMENT(S)
Date: September 30, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #17)
Date: October 03, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW Â (Motion #21)
Date: October 06, 2022ORDER - DISMISSAL Â (Motion #25)
Date: November 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #25)
Date: October 17, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #25)
Date: October 17, 2022ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED)
Date: October 12, 2022STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: October 07, 2022ADMISSION OF SERVICE Â (Motion #17)
Date: July 13, 2022ORDER - DISMISSAL Â (Motion #17)
Date: August 25, 2022ORDER - DISMISSAL Â (Motion #19)
Date: September 13, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #14)
Date: July 08, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #17)
Date: August 24, 2022ORDER - DISMISSAL Â (Motion #18)
Date: September 13, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #18)
Date: September 13, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #23)
Date: October 06, 2022PROOF OF SERVICE Â (Motion #21)
Date: October 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #23)
Date: October 20, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #18)
Date: July 29, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #12)
Date: August 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #20)
Date: October 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #20)
Date: October 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #20)
Date: October 20, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #25)
Date: November 14, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #16)
Date: August 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #22)
Date: October 20, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #26)
Date: November 23, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT
Date: July 26, 2022STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: October 27, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: October 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #22)
Date: October 20, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: October 20, 2022PRE-TRIAL DOCUMENT(S)
Date: September 29, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #19)
Date: September 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #23)
Date: October 20, 2022PRE-TRIAL DOCUMENT(S)
Date: September 29, 2022ORDER - DISMISSAL Â (Motion #24)
Date: November 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #23)
Date: October 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #22)
Date: October 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #23)
Date: October 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #21)
Date: October 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #21)
Date: October 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #21)
Date: October 20, 2022CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: December 01, 2022STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI) Â (Motion #26) *Corrected*
Date: November 23, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: November 23, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #17)
Date: July 13, 2022ANSWER
Date: December 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #17)
Date: July 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #12)
Date: July 08, 2022ORDER - DISMISSAL Â (Motion #26)
Date: December 13, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #26)
Date: December 13, 2022STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: December 30, 2022STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: January 11, 2023STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: January 30, 2023ANSWER
Date: June 21, 2021ANSWER
Date: June 29, 2021INTERROGATORIES
Date: June 29, 2021ANSWER
Date: June 29, 2021ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: July 09, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 21, 2021ANSWER
Date: July 08, 2021INTERROGATORIES
Date: June 29, 2021ANSWER
Date: July 02, 2021ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: June 29, 2021ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: July 01, 2021PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: June 29, 2021ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: June 29, 2021ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: June 29, 2021ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: July 20, 2021ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: July 06, 2021ANSWER
Date: August 24, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 17, 2021RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: June 29, 2021ANSWER
Date: June 21, 2021ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: June 29, 2021ANSWER
Date: June 28, 2021ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: June 29, 2021ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: June 17, 2021ANSWER
Date: June 29, 2021ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: June 25, 2021SUMMONS-SUPPLEMENTAL (POST RJI)
Date: December 06, 2021ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: July 12, 2021ANSWER
Date: July 12, 2021ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: July 13, 2021ANSWER
Date: July 20, 2021ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: July 20, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 20, 2021ORDER - TRIAL SCHEDULING
Date: July 14, 2021ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: July 21, 2021ORDER - DISMISSAL Â (Motion #4)
Date: March 15, 2022ORDER - DISMISSAL Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 15, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: March 18, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: March 16, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: March 22, 2022ORDER - DISMISSAL Â (Motion #8)
Date: March 18, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: March 18, 2022ORDER - DISMISSAL Â (Motion #9)
Date: March 18, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 23, 2021ANSWER
Date: August 17, 2021COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: December 06, 2021ANSWER
Date: September 08, 2021ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: August 06, 2021STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: November 09, 2021ANSWER
Date: December 17, 2021ANSWER
Date: December 15, 2021NOTICE TO COUNTY CLERK - AMENDMENT OF CAPTION
Date: December 06, 2021ANSWER
Date: December 08, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 08, 2021ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: December 07, 2021ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: December 08, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 10, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 13, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 30, 2023 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Redco Corp.'s Stipulation of Discontinuance with Prejudice |
||
January 11, 2023 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
December 30, 2022 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation Alray Construction & RE Hebert and Company |
||
December 13, 2022 |
ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #26) AS TO INSULATION DISTRIBUTORS INC |
||
December 13, 2022 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #26) Order Granting Dismissal of Behalf of IDI |
||
December 01, 2022 |
CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) Spirax Sarco, Inc. |
||
November 23, 2022 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #26) IDI NOM for Dismissal |
||
November 23, 2022 |
STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI) (Motion #26) *Corrected* IDI Signed Stipulation of Discontinuance |
||
November 23, 2022 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
November 14, 2022 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #25) Notice of Entry - Order of Dismissal - Pfaudler, Inc. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.