Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Natalie G Rammacher, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Marasco, Paul Angelo, against Bitter Honey Llc, Rr Street Llc, represented by Colin, Robert P, Schiffmacher, Jennifer Volhard, in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, NY, . Monroe County, NY Superior Courts Monroe County Supreme Court with Christopher S Ciaccio presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 27, 2020 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Premises Liability) |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMonroe County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Filing Court HouseMonroe County Supreme Court |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 27, 2020ANSWER
Date: May 29, 2020ANSWER
Date: May 29, 2020DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: May 29, 2020ANSWER
Date: May 06, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 30, 2020 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | |
July 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AOS - Boxcar Donuts, LLC |
|
June 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Exhibit C- Answer- Bitter Honey final |
|
June 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit B- Answer- RR Street final |
|
June 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A- S&C final |
|
June 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT Signed 3rd Party S&C |
|
May 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Answer with Cross-Complaint | |
May 29, 2020 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
May 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Demand for Bill of Particulars and Demands | |
May 07, 2020 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.