Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Einstein, Stephen, Poulin, Anthony Scott, against Madeline Astacio, in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, NY, . Monroe County, NY Superior Courts Monroe County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMonroe County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court HouseMonroe County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time28 days |
AFFIRMATION
Date: January 20, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 20, 2022ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION
Date: January 28, 2020JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: January 20, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 20, 2022 | AFFIRMATION | ||
January 20, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 20, 2022 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) TMP#359467 |
||
January 28, 2020 | Docket Event | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION | |
January 23, 2020 | Docket Event | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION | |
January 15, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.