Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
General Security, Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Donovan, Linda L, Mccormick, Thomas Robert, against Mae Collins, in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, NY, . Monroe County, NY Superior Courts Monroe County Supreme Court with John J Ark presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 23, 2019 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions103 days |
Filing LocationMonroe County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseMonroe County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time103 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 23, 2019ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: December 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2) Notification and Exemption Claim Form Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: December 22, 2021RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: December 22, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: December 22, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED)
Date: December 22, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: December 23, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 30, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: January 14, 2022JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: December 04, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 22, 2021ORDER - OTHER
Date: January 05, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: December 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #3)
Date: February 01, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: December 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1) Notification and Exemption Claim Form Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: December 22, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #3)
Date: February 01, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #3)
Date: February 01, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #3)
Date: January 14, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 14, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1-8 Â (Motion #1) Exhibit 1-8 Labeled Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 20, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: January 21, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 04, 2019LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: March 30, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 22, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 28, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: December 23, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 14, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #3)
Date: February 01, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 01, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #3)
Date: February 01, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #3)
Date: February 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #3)
Date: February 01, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: February 14, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: February 01, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 12, 2022SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: July 28, 2023SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 26, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: January 04, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: October 13, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 28, 2023 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
January 26, 2023 |
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
||
October 13, 2022 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
July 12, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
April 27, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
April 20, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1-8 (Motion #1) Exhibit 1-8 Labeled Redacted per 22 NYCRR Exhibit 1-8 Labeled Redacted |
||
April 20, 2022 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT (Motion #1) Notice of Exhibits |
||
March 30, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Adjournment Request- Agreement by All Parties |
||
March 30, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED | ||
February 14, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.