Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
American Advisors Group, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Silver, Jason David, against Dennis Russell Hart Sr, John Doe 1 Through John Doe 10 Said Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To Plaintiff, Intended To Be Possible Tenants Or Occupants Of The Premises, Or Corporations, Persons, Or Other Entities Having Or Claiming A Lien Upon The Mortgaged Premises, United States Of America Acting On Behalf Of The Secretary Of Housing And Urban Development, represented by Roach, Mary Keefe, in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, NY, . Monroe County, NY Superior Courts Monroe County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2018 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMonroe County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseMonroe County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time74 days |
COMPLAINT
Date: December 31, 2018STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: March 15, 2019STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: March 14, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 24, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 22, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 15, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY | |
March 14, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
March 14, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION | |
March 14, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | |
February 13, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES | |
January 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 3215 AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING-DENNIS RUSSELL HART, SR |
|
January 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING ON BEHALF OF THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN |
|
January 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM |
|
January 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOHN DOE |
|
January 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - DENNIS R. HART SR. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.