Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Corn Hill Landing Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Dick, Andrew John, against Nilsa Irizarry Del-Rio, Orlando Malve Valentin, represented by Furlano, Michael Anthony, in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, NY, . Monroe County, NY Superior Courts Monroe County Supreme Court with Annmarie Taddeo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAnnmarie Taddeo Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2018 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions78 days |
Filing LocationMonroe County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseMonroe County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time427 days |
ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: October 16, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #3)
Date: March 02, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #3)
Date: January 21, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #3)
Date: January 21, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #2)
Date: October 03, 2019ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #2)
Date: October 03, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 16, 2019ORDER - TRIAL SCHEDULING
Date: August 28, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 20, 2019ORDER - TRIAL SCHEDULING
Date: August 19, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 07, 2019ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: March 19, 2019ORDER - SEVERANCE
Date: March 19, 2019ANSWER
Date: March 03, 2019EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) *Corrected*
Date: March 01, 2019RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: February 26, 2019COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: February 01, 2019ANSWER
Date: January 28, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 31, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #3) | |
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #3) | |
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE (Motion #3) | |
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #3) letters |
|
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #3) affidavit of service |
|
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #3) affidavit of service |
|
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #3) subpoena |
|
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #3) subpoena |
|
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #3) judgment |
|
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #3) judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.