Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Christopher A Dimarzo, Village Crossing Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Dick, Andrew John, against Al Micchia, represented by Pupatelli, Peter Paul, in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, NY, . Monroe County, NY Superior Courts Monroe County Supreme Court with Gail A Donofrio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGail A Donofrio Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2018 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions32 days |
Filing LocationMonroe County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseMonroe County Supreme Court |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #3)
Date: May 26, 2020ORDER - OTHER
Date: May 28, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #2)
Date: May 04, 2020ORDER - OTHER
Date: February 20, 2020ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #2)
Date: February 12, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2)
Date: December 17, 2019ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1)
Date: October 16, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1)
Date: September 27, 2019ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1)
Date: September 27, 2019RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: July 02, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: July 02, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 31, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE- 8/5/20@10:00 |
|
May 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #3) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE |
|
May 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #3) SCHEDULE C - Down Payment Receipt & New Lease |
|
May 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #3) SCHEDULE B - Payment Receipts for Settlement |
|
May 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #3) SCHEDULE A - Settlement Agreement |
|
May 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #3) *Corrected* AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE |
|
May 04, 2020 | Docket Event | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #2) | |
February 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER CONTEMPT ORDER SIGNED |
|
February 12, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #2) | |
January 17, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.