Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Citibank, N.A. Not In Its Individual Capacity But Solely As Trustee Of Nrz Pass-Through Trust Vi, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Brennan, Jennifer R., Manniello, Michael C, Roach, Peter, Sherer, Joshua Alan, against Beneficial Homeowner Service Corporation, Bertha L. Key, Monroe County Clerk, Ruby Felton, in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, NY, . Monroe County, NY Superior Courts Monroe County Supreme Court with Foreclosure Part A presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 26, 2018 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJuly 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMonroe County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseMonroe County Supreme Court |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 26, 2018ORDER - OTHER
Date: October 25, 2019ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1)
Date: October 18, 2019ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1)
Date: August 20, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: August 20, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 03, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 14, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) | |
November 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) Notice of Entry |
|
October 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER OOR and default judgment is denied |
|
October 18, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) | |
September 20, 2019 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE (Motion #1) | |
August 20, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) | |
August 20, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) | |
August 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - O (Motion #1) Schedule A |
|
August 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion #1) Lost Loan Modification Affidavit |
|
August 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #1) Affirmation of Regularity |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.