Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Debra J Castellani, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Schwind, Lawrence John, against David J Castellani, in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, NY, . Monroe County, NY Superior Courts with John B Gallagher presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn B Gallagher Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 06, 2016 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Uncontested |
Last RefreshedApril 27, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMonroe County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 21, 2020 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
December 21, 2020 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
December 15, 2020 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
December 10, 2020 | MATRIMONIAL ADDENDUM (840M) (POST RJI) | ||
December 09, 2020 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Consent Order - Approved by Defendant's Attorney |
||
December 09, 2020 |
SEPARATION AGREEMENT Modification of Separation Agreement |
||
December 09, 2020 | CONSENT TO EFILING | ||
April 06, 2016 | COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.