Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Jewish Home Of Rochester, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Lynch, Anna E., against Louise P. Richardson, in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, NY, . Monroe County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMonroe County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
CONFESSION OF JUDGMENT (AFFIDAVIT OF DEFENDANT)
Date: September 07, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 20, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: September 20, 2021SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: November 16, 2021SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: December 29, 2021JUDGMENT BY CONFESSION (PROPOSED)
Date: September 13, 2021JUDGMENT BY CONFESSION (PROPOSED)
Date: September 07, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 29, 2021 |
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT Satisfy Judgment and Amended Judgment |
||
November 16, 2021 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
September 20, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 20, 2021 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
September 13, 2021 |
JUDGMENT BY CONFESSION (PROPOSED) Amended |
||
September 07, 2021 | CONFESSION OF JUDGMENT (AFFIDAVIT OF DEFENDANT) | ||
September 07, 2021 | JUDGMENT BY CONFESSION (PROPOSED) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.