Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Bank Of America, N.A., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Barreto, Jonathan Alexander, Sheerin, John J, Valle, Jonathan Irving, against Jacqueline M Heeder, in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, NY, . Monroe County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedAugust 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMonroe County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 03, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 03, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 10, 2021ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION
Date: September 16, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: October 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: October 22, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 22, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 22, 2021NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: December 10, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT
Date: December 22, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: October 22, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 22, 2021 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT PULL JUDGMENT LTR |
||
December 10, 2021 |
NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) Notice Discontinuing Action |
||
October 22, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
October 22, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Bank Statement |
||
October 22, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
October 22, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 22, 2021 | AFFIRMATION | ||
September 16, 2021 | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION | ||
September 10, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 03, 2021 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT JACQUELINE HEEDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.