Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Jeffrey Luellen, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Carmello, Corey John, Foss, Kelly Schaefer, against Flower City Arts Center, Inc. And Cheryl Mckeiver, represented by Appelbaum, Michael Eric, in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, NY, . Monroe County, NY Superior Courts with Daniel J Doyle presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationMonroe County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 02, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 14, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: October 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: September 02, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: October 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: September 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: September 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: September 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: September 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 07, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 14, 2021ANSWER
Date: September 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: September 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: September 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 07, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: October 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 07, 2022RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: October 07, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: October 18, 2022ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 13, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: January 17, 2023ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: January 19, 2023ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION
Date: January 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: January 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: January 09, 2023DECISION ON MOTION -SUBMIT ORD / JGMT Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: January 09, 2023ORDER - OTHER
Date: February 27, 2023ORDER - MEDIATION
Date: February 27, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 17, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 21, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT
Date: February 23, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 26, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 26, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
February 27, 2023 |
ORDER - OTHER check out subpoena records |
||
February 27, 2023 | ORDER - MEDIATION | ||
February 23, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT | ||
February 21, 2023 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) Proposed Order for Release of Subpoenaed Records for Copying |
||
February 17, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service of Notice of Eentry with Order and Judicial Subpoena on Rochester Police Depart Affidavit of Service of Notice of Eentry with Order and Judicial Subpoena on Rochester Police Depart ... show more |
||
February 17, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service of Notice of Eentry with Order and Judicial Subpoena on Monroe County DA |
||
January 19, 2023 | ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING | ||
January 17, 2023 | Notice of Entry (Order for Subpoena for RPD and Monroe County DA) | ||
January 13, 2023 |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) supboenas |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.