Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Amber James, Amber Johnson, Annalisa Barron, Breyana Clark, Bridget Strub, (total of 41) See All filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Dolby-Shields, Elliot, Roth, Audra R, against Gerald Ludwig, Michael Koerner, The City Of Rochester, Todd Baxter, represented by Clark, Adam M., Noone, Christopher Stephen, Rodi, Maria E, in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, NY, . Monroe County, NY Superior Courts with Daniel J Doyle presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel J Doyle Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Police Misconduct) |
Last RefreshedJuly 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMonroe County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 02, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 29, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 29, 2021ANSWER
Date: January 31, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 31, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: March 15, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: March 15, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: March 15, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: April 11, 2022ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: March 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 15, 2022ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 02, 2022NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: March 15, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 29, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 29, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 02, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 26, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: June 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 26, 2022ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: February 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 26, 2022RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: March 15, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 12, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: March 16, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: April 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 26, 2022ANSWER
Date: September 20, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: August 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: December 06, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: December 06, 2022DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: March 24, 2023ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: March 13, 2023NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: March 24, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: March 24, 2023ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: May 19, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 09, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 17, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 19, 2023 | ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING | ||
May 17, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
May 09, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
March 24, 2023 | DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS | ||
March 24, 2023 | NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION | ||
March 24, 2023 | DEMAND FOR: | ||
March 13, 2023 | ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING | ||
December 06, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B City's 12-5-22 letter |
||
December 06, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
December 06, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Plaintiffs' proposed scheduling order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.