Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Malik Dumas, filed a(n) Agency Action - Administrative case represented by Mcclary, Christopher Paul, against Ellen Yacknin, Sandra Doorley, represented by Porter, Kaylan, in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, NY, . Monroe County, NY Superior Courts with Gail A Donofrio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGail A Donofrio Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 11, 2021 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Cplr Article 78 |
Last RefreshedDecember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationMonroe County, NY |
Matter TypeAgency Action |
NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: June 11, 2021PETITION
Date: June 11, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: June 21, 2021RJI -RE: OTHER *Corrected*
Date: June 11, 2021NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: June 28, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT
Date: August 10, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: June 28, 2021NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: June 11, 2021PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: June 22, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 10, 2021 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT | ||
June 28, 2021 | NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) | ||
June 28, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION | ||
June 22, 2021 | PROOF OF SERVICE | ||
June 21, 2021 | COURT NOTICE | ||
June 11, 2021 | NOTICE OF PETITION | ||
June 11, 2021 | PETITION | ||
June 11, 2021 |
RJI -RE: OTHER *Corrected* Article 78 Petition |
||
June 11, 2021 | NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.