Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Pennymac Loan Services, Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Broyles, Mark K., against John C. Tefft Jr A K A John C. Tefft, John Doe And Jane Doe Said Names Being Fictitious, It Being The Intention Of Plaintiff To Designate Any And All Occupants Of Premises Being Foreclosed Herein, Sustainable Neighborhoods, Llc, Tanya Tefft A K A Tanya A. Tefft, The Secretary Of Housing And Urban Development, (total of 5) See All represented by Reynolds, Ransom Pratt, in the jurisdiction of Madison County, NY, . Madison County, NY Superior Courts with Patrick O'Sullivan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 05, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJanuary 31, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMadison County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint is a foreclosure action filed by PennyMac Loan Services, LLC against John C. Tefft Jr., Tanya Tefft, the Secretary of Housing and Urban Development, and Sustainable Neighborhoods, LLC. The mortgaged premises in question is located at 2...
FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM
Date: January 18, 2024ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: November 08, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 01, 2023ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: November 08, 2023RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: November 08, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 08, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 01, 2023OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: November 09, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: November 09, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 17, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 01, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 01, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 20, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: October 05, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: October 05, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 17, 2023CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: October 05, 2023CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: October 05, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 01, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 18, 2024 | FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM | ||
November 09, 2023 | OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT | ||
November 09, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
November 08, 2023 | ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) | ||
November 08, 2023 | ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A) | ||
November 08, 2023 | RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | ||
November 08, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 01, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE - NO DOES | ||
November 01, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT 3215 AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE - TANYA TEFFT AKA TANYA A. TEFFT |
||
November 01, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - TANYA TEFFT AKA TANYA A. TEFFT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.