Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Condor Fire Sprinkler Co., Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Couch, Mark W., against Black Horse Group, L.L.C., Endurance Assurance Corporation, represented by Adams, Daniel P., in the jurisdiction of Madison County, NY, . Madison County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 06, 2023 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedFebruary 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationMadison County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
This complaint was filed by Condor Fire Sprinkler Co., LLC against Black Horse Group, L.L.C. and Endurance Assurance Corporation. Condor Fire Sprinkler Co., LLC is the plaintiff in this case. The complaint alleges that Condor Fire Sprinkler Co., LLC ...
EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: October 26, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: October 26, 2023ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: October 18, 2023ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: October 06, 2023REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: October 26, 2023ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: October 18, 2023THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT
Date: October 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: October 06, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: October 06, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 06, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 12, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 20, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 14, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 26, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Labor and Material Bond |
||
October 26, 2023 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Change of Venue |
||
October 26, 2023 |
REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S) Reply to Counterclaim |
||
October 18, 2023 |
ANSWER (AMENDED) Amended document title only |
||
October 18, 2023 | ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) | ||
October 06, 2023 | ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) | ||
October 06, 2023 | THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT | ||
October 06, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Payment Bond |
||
October 06, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: Change of Venue |
||
September 20, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.