Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Sidney Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Shaw, Amanda C, against Joseph A Davis, in the jurisdiction of Madison County, NY, . Madison County, NY Superior Courts with Patrick O'Sullivan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePatrick O'Sullivan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2023 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMadison County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
JUDGMENT
Date: August 17, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 21, 2023JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)
Date: August 15, 2023OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: August 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: January 25, 2023ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT
Date: March 07, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 21, 2023RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: July 21, 2023EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: July 21, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 03, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 03, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 25, 2023OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: July 21, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 25, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 17, 2023 | JUDGMENT | ||
August 15, 2023 | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) | ||
August 08, 2023 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ORDER |
||
July 21, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
July 21, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of Mailing |
||
July 21, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1) Attorney Fees Affirmation, Affirmation in Support of Default JD & Military Status, Affirmation of No ... show more Attorney Fees Affirmation, Affirmation in Support of Default JD & Military Status, Affirmation of No ... show more Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
July 21, 2023 | RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION | ||
July 21, 2023 | EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
July 21, 2023 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT RJI OTHER COURT DOCUMENT |
||
March 07, 2023 | ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.