Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Rebecca L Stange, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Bettenhauser, Meredith A., Kress, Danielle Beth, against Thomas J Stange, in the jurisdiction of Madison County, NY, . Madison County, NY Superior Courts with Patrick O'Sullivan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePatrick O'Sullivan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 08, 2022 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Uncontested |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMadison County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2023 | QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER | ||
June 17, 2023 | QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
June 17, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
January 05, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
January 05, 2023 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | ||
January 05, 2023 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSION OF LAW | ||
December 13, 2022 | OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT | ||
December 12, 2022 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY | ||
December 12, 2022 | OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT | ||
December 09, 2022 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.