Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Michele F. Posloski, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Eisenhut, Clifford Craig, against Thomas Posloski And Pozzie'S Auto Refinishing, Inc., represented by Miga, Brian Michael, Wangerman, Laurence Ayres, in the jurisdiction of Madison County, NY, . Madison County, NY Superior Courts with Patrick O'Sullivan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePatrick O'Sullivan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 02, 2022 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Replevin And Tort) |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMadison County, NY |
Matter TypeCollections |
ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: July 07, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 18, 2022OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: November 15, 2022RJI -RE: OTHER
Date: November 15, 2022REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: September 22, 2022REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: July 13, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 29, 2022OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: January 23, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: January 20, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 01, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 02, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 20, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: April 07, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 25, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 21, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 06, 2023NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: April 07, 2023OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: July 18, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 07, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 13, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 18, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 25, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE defendant's attorney's letter in response |
||
September 21, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
July 18, 2023 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ORDER |
||
July 13, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
April 18, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #2) Affirmation in Reply and in Opposition to Cross-Motion |
||
April 07, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #3) Affirmation in support of cross motion and opposition w ex A |
||
April 07, 2023 |
NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #3) notice of cross motion |
||
April 07, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
April 06, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
March 20, 2023 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #2) Amended Notice of Motion |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.