Case Last Refreshed: 2 days ago
Americu Credit Union, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Shaw, Amanda C, against Cameron S Latimer, Morgan T Manzare, in the jurisdiction of Madison County, NY, . Madison County, NY Superior Courts Supreme.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 29, 2022 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedMay 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMadison County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
This complaint was filed in the Madison County Supreme Court in the State of New York. The plaintiff is AmeriCU Credit Union, and the defendants are Morgan T. Manzare and Cameron S. Latimer. The plaintiff alleges that the defendants owe them a total ...
AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 01, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 01, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 01, 2022JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)
Date: November 01, 2022OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: November 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: May 04, 2022JUDGMENT
Date: November 01, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 22, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 01, 2022ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT
Date: June 24, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 29, 2022SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 29, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 22, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 22, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 01, 2022 | Affidavit of Mailing - Cameron | ||
November 01, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
November 01, 2022 | Affidavit of Mailing - Morgan | ||
November 01, 2022 | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) | ||
November 01, 2022 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT UPDATED REVIEW SHEET (2) |
||
November 01, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
November 01, 2022 | Affidavit in Support of Default Judgment and Military Status | ||
June 24, 2022 | ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT | ||
June 22, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Admission of Service - Cameron |
||
June 22, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Morgan |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.