Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Moody, Helen, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Moody, Bobby, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with Francisca P. Tisher presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 20, 2006 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions104 days |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time104 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice 912910-Notice Filed/Issued By: 931220 - Attorney for Petitioner NOTICE [912910] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PETITIONER [931220] |
|
April 03, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice 912910-Notice Filed/Issued By: 931220 - Attorney for Petitioner NOTICE [912910] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PETITIONER [931220] |
|
April 03, 2007 | Docket Event |
Judgment 926110-Judgment Filed/Issued By: 931220 - Attorney for Petitioner JUDGMENT [926110] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PETITIONER [931220] |
|
April 03, 2007 | Docket Event |
Converted Stat Closure Disposition Date: Apr 3 2007 Type: 944110 - Judgment/Order Manner : 942110 - After Hearing |
|
March 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
Request: Enter Default 929120-Request: Default Filed/Issued By: 931220 - Attorney for Petitioner REQUEST: DEFAULT [929120] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PETITIONER [931220] |
|
March 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
Stipulation 913510-Stipulation Filed/Issued By: 931220 - Attorney for Petitioner STIPULATION [913510] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PETITIONER [931220] |
|
March 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
Declaration 913310-Declaration Filed/Issued By: 931220 - Attorney for Petitioner DECLARATION [913310] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PETITIONER [931220] |
|
February 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
Minute Order 913610-Minute Order Filed/Issued By: MINUTE ORDER [913610] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
|
February 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause (Non-DCSS) 931210-OSC Hearing; Moody, H. vs. Moody, B. Motion OSC Details: 911290 - Other ; Judge: J21160 Tisher Francisca P. Additional Info : Injunctive Order Judge: Tisher, Francisca P. |
|
January 24, 2007 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service 912310-Proof of Service Filed/Issued By: 931220 - Attorney for Petitioner PROOF OF SERVICE [912310] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PETITIONER [931220] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.