Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Americu Credit Union, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Radel, Patrick Gerard, against Melonie A. Hood, in the jurisdiction of Madison County, NY, . Madison County, NY Superior Courts with Donald F Cerio presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 02, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMadison County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 02, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 11, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) Â (Motion #1) *Corrected*
Date: February 05, 2021RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: February 02, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: February 02, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: February 02, 2021STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: February 02, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 19, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 11, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 28, 2021 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT JUDGMEMT |
||
April 28, 2021 |
JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) Statement for Judgment (proposed) |
||
April 26, 2021 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ORDER |
||
April 19, 2021 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) Order Granting Summary Judgment and Attorneys' Fees (proposed) |
||
March 11, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of Mailing Attorney Radel's letter of 3/11/21 to defendant |
||
March 11, 2021 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1) Letter to Court requesting motion adjournment |
||
March 11, 2021 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1) Attorney Radel letter of 3/11/21 to defendant with copy to Court |
||
February 24, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of Mailing Amended Supplemental Attorney Affirmation of Patrick G. Radel, Esq. to defendan Affidavit of Mailing Amended Supplemental Attorney Affirmation of Patrick G. Radel, Esq. to defendan ... show more |
||
February 24, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Exhibit B to Supplemental Affirmation-Affidavit of Mailing Bare Summons and COVID Notice to defendan Exhibit B to Supplemental Affirmation-Affidavit of Mailing Bare Summons and COVID Notice to defendan ... show more |
||
February 24, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Exhibit A to Supplemental Affirmation-2/5/21 letter from Patrick G. Radel, Esq. to defendant |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.