Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Steven Dailey, Yvette Dailey, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Bielicki, Scott Thomas, against Access Federal Credit Union, Christopher W Santilli, Jane Doe, John Doe, Mia M Santilli, (total of 8) See All represented by Evans, James F., Shaw, Amanda C, in the jurisdiction of Madison County, NY, . Madison County, NY Superior Courts with Donald F Cerio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDonald F Cerio Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 28, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMadison County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 18, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: July 09, 2021JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE (PROPOSED) - VACANT/ABANDONED PROPERTY
Date: August 13, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 01, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 01, 2021 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
September 01, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 13, 2021 | JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE (PROPOSED) - VACANT/ABANDONED PROPERTY | ||
July 09, 2021 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
July 09, 2021 | AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY | ||
June 25, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION Of Service - Conference form |
||
June 22, 2021 | FORECLOSURE COVID-19 CONFERENCE STATUS FORM | ||
April 22, 2021 | OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT | ||
April 20, 2021 | RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | ||
March 25, 2021 | ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.