Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Daryl A. Wilson, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Eisenhut, Keith A., Neff, Asa Shalom, Coonrod, Gabrielle Kristine, against Kerry A. Linden, represented by Cerio, Marian Judith, in the jurisdiction of Madison County, NY, . Madison County, NY Superior Courts with Patrick O'Sullivan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePatrick O'Sullivan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 20, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedMarch 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMadison County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 20, 2023 | AFFIRMATION | ||
March 20, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OF DEFENDANT | ||
March 20, 2023 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) | ||
March 13, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
March 01, 2023 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
January 25, 2023 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY | ||
January 25, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT | ||
January 24, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
January 24, 2023 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY | ||
October 13, 2022 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.