Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Hughes, Adam Michael, against Jason M Gaiser, in the jurisdiction of Madison County, NY, . Madison County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 28, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMadison County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 28, 2021ANSWER
Date: August 31, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 18, 2021ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT
Date: August 23, 2021NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: June 10, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 18, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 10, 2022 | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
August 31, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
August 23, 2021 | ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT | ||
August 18, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
August 18, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 28, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.