Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Community Memorial Hospital, Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Evans, James F., against Stephen Phillips, in the jurisdiction of Madison County, NY, . Madison County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationMadison County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 12, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: March 24, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: March 24, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS
Date: March 24, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: October 05, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 25, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 24, 2021SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: October 20, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 20, 2022 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
October 05, 2022 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT SATISFIED AMENDED INCOME EXECUTION |
||
March 24, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
March 24, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
March 24, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS | ||
March 24, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
January 25, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 12, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.