Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Community Memorial Hospital, Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Evans, James F., against Jason Owen, in the jurisdiction of Madison County, NY, . Madison County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2020 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedDecember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationMadison County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 21, 2020JUDGMENT
Date: March 04, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 07, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 03, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS
Date: March 03, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: March 03, 2021SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: June 17, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 17, 2022 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
March 04, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
March 03, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
March 03, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS | ||
March 03, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
January 07, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
December 21, 2020 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.