Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) General Property - Property case in the jurisdiction of Madison County. This case was filed in Madison County Superior Courts with HON. DONALD F. CERIO, JR. presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management118 days |
|
Filing DateMarch 19, 2020 |
CategoryOther Real Property |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationMadison County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2021 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001) CERIO, JR. (Motion Part) Judge: HON. DONALD F. CERIO, JR. |
|
January 08, 2021 | Hearing |
POST-DECIDED CERIO, JR. (Court Activity) Held Judge: HON. DONALD F. CERIO, JR. |
|
September 25, 2020 | Hearing |
TRIAL SET FOR CERIO, JR. (Trial Part) Held Judge: HON. DONALD F. CERIO, JR. |
|
August 12, 2020 | Hearing |
PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE CERIO, JR. (Pre-Trial Conference) Held Judge: HON. DONALD F. CERIO, JR. |
|
August 04, 2020 | Hearing |
NOTE OF ISSUE FILED CERIO, JR. (Court Activity) Held Judge: HON. DONALD F. CERIO, JR. |
|
July 15, 2020 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE CERIO, JR. (Prelim. Conference) Held Judge: HON. DONALD F. CERIO, JR. |
|
May 15, 2020 | Hearing |
RETURN ORAL ARGUMENT (Motion #001) CERIO, JR. (Motion Part) Judge: HON. DONALD F. CERIO, JR. |
|
March 19, 2020 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #001) CERIO, JR. (Motion Part) Judge: HON. DONALD F. CERIO, JR. |
|
March 19, 2020 | Motion |
COMPEL DISCOVERY (Motion #001) Decided: 01/08/2021PER EMAIL DATED 4/21/20, DFC W Before Justice: HON. DONALD F. CERIO, JR. Answer demanded: No Judge: HON. DONALD F. CERIO, JR. |
|
March 19, 2020 | Motion |
COMPEL DISCOVERY (Motion #001) Before Justice: HON. DONALD F. CERIO, JR. Answer demanded: No Judge: HON. DONALD F. CERIO, JR. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.