Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Slamowitz, Mitchell G, against Eryk E Olson, in the jurisdiction of Livingston County, NY, . Livingston County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 14, 2020 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedJuly 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLivingston County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 30, 2020JUDGMENT
Date: October 07, 2021ORDER - OTHER
Date: October 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: February 14, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 30, 2020DEFECT CHECKLIST
Date: June 22, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 28, 2020AFFIRMATION
Date: December 28, 2020NOTICE
Date: June 21, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: December 28, 2020JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: December 28, 2020AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS
Date: December 28, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: February 14, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: December 28, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 14, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 07, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
October 07, 2021 |
ORDER - OTHER Administrative Review |
||
June 22, 2021 | DEFECT CHECKLIST | ||
June 21, 2021 |
NOTICE Administrative Review to the Court |
||
December 28, 2020 |
AFFIDAVIT Non-expiration of sol |
||
December 28, 2020 |
AFFIRMATION Mil Aff |
||
December 28, 2020 |
AFFIRMATION Aff in Support |
||
December 28, 2020 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
December 28, 2020 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS | ||
December 28, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Client Statement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.