Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Mariner Finance, Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Gitlin, Robert Brian, against Sally A. Weed, represented by Resnick, Joshua Colin, in the jurisdiction of Livingston County, NY, . Livingston County, NY Superior Courts Livingston County Supreme Court with Thomas E Moran presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas E Moran Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 10, 2019 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions87 days |
Filing LocationLivingston County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Filing Court HouseLivingston County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time91 days |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #01)
Date: March 01, 2020ANSWER
Date: January 23, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #01)
Date: February 10, 2020RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #01)
Date: February 10, 2020JUDGMENT
Date: March 09, 2020ORDER - OTHER (Motion #01)
Date: March 06, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #01)
Date: March 03, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #01)
Date: March 02, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #01)
Date: February 10, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #01)
Date: February 10, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 10, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 10, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #01) | |
March 09, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
March 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) (Motion #01) AS PER ORDER |
|
March 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #01) ORDER - JUDGMENT |
|
March 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #01) MAILING MEMORANDUM OF LAW |
|
March 03, 2020 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #01) | |
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #01) | |
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION (Motion #01) | |
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #01) | |
March 01, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #01) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.