Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Stiller, Craig Scott, Winograd, Ian Zev, against Brieana Benedict, in the jurisdiction of Livingston County, NY, . Livingston County, NY Superior Courts Livingston County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 05, 2019 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions95 days |
Filing LocationLivingston County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Filing Court HouseLivingston County Supreme Court |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 05, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 05, 2019NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: November 27, 2020JUDGMENT
Date: October 27, 2020NOTICE
Date: March 10, 2020ORDER - OTHER
Date: September 29, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 27, 2020 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
October 27, 2020 | JUDGMENT | ||
September 29, 2020 |
ORDER - OTHER Transmittal Sheet |
||
March 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE Administrative Review to the Court |
|
March 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIRMATION |
|
March 09, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION OF NON-MILITARY | |
March 09, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS | |
March 09, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR | |
March 09, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF | |
March 09, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.